MD HB64 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the time limit within which a court may affirm, modify, or reverse a decision by a local alcoholic beverages licensing board on whether to approve, suspend, revoke, or restrict a license.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Licensing Boards - Judicial Review
Sponsors
Del. Cathleen Vitale [R] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Ned Carey [D] | Del. Mark Chang [D] |
Del. Tony McConkey [R] | Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Herbert McMillan [R] | Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {503890/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 10:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Circuit Courts
Judicial Review
License Commissioners, Boards of
Statutes of Limitation
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Circuit Courts
Judicial Review
License Commissioners, Boards of
Statutes of Limitation