MD HB652 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the administration of a medically important antimicrobial drug in feed or water to cattle, swine, or poultry unless ordered by a licensed veterinarian through a certain prescription or a veterinary feed directive; exempting dairy cattle on a farm operation with a herd size of fewer than 300 dairy cattle; requiring the Department of Agriculture, by January 1, 2021, to adopt regulations prohibiting the routine administration of a medically important antimicrobial drug to dairy cattle entering a dry cycle except in certain cases; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-16) (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-38) (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-37) (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {743520/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (44-94) (Y: 45 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (98-38)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (29-16)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {804232/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (98-37)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {743520/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (44-94)
2019-03-12HouseSpecial Order until 03/13 (Delegate Cox) Adopted
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {220317/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0652&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0652f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0652t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0652e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_678_hb0652e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0652_22031701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0652_74352001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0652_80423201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0652.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0652_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0460.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0563.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0652_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1055.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1211.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback