MD HB657 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to take disciplinary actions against applicants for a license to practice dentistry or dental hygiene, licensed dentists, or licensed dental hygienists if the applicant or licensee demonstrates a course of conduct or provides a service that is inconsistent with the standard of care for their profession.
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |