MD HB661 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, on or before January 1, 2015, to establish a process by which death certificates can be filed electronically and to educate physicians, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners regarding the process.
Title
Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates
Sponsors
Del. Leroy Myers [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {916883/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Death
Electronic Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Job Training
Minors
Nurses
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Health
Vital Records
Death
Electronic Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Job Training
Minors
Nurses
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Health
Vital Records