MD HB683 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB614
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, under certain circumstances, a covered employee or a dependent of a covered employee is not entitled to workers' compensation or benefits if a certain accidental personal injury, compensable hernia, or occupational disease was caused solely by the effect of medical cannabis on the employee and the medical cannabis was not administered or taken with the written certification of a certifying provider or the written instructions of a physician; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB683 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
SB461 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
SB461 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 9 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 660 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |