MD HB689 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making a contractor under a public work contract that knew or reasonably should have known of the contractor's obligation to pay the prevailing wage rate and that deliberately failed or refused to pay the prevailing wage rate is liable to a public body for liquidated damages of $250 for each laborer or other employee under specified circumstances.
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Liquidated Damages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-50) (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-50) (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-50) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {363395/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contractors
Contracts
Damages
Liability
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Public Works
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment
Contractors
Contracts
Damages
Liability
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Public Works
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment