MD HB692 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a campaign finance entity to invest funds the entity receives in a certificate of deposit with a term of 1 year or less, or in a United States Treasury bill.
Title
Election Law - Campaign Funds - Investments
Sponsors
Del. Wade Kach [R] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-26 | Third Reading Passed (130-8) | |
2010-02-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Special Order 2/24 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-05 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading Ways and Means |