MD HB692 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who is not a specified licensee may not complete the transfer of a specified rifle or shotgun as transferor or transferee, except under specified circumstances; requiring, before a specified transfer is conducted, the transferor and transferee to meet jointly with a specified licensee and request that the licensee facilitate the transfer; requiring a licensee to take specified actions when facilitating a transfer; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2016-03-14 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Fees
Fines
Gifts
Guns
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Fees
Fines
Gifts
Guns
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records