MD HB704 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a track where racing is conducted by the State Fair Society from being a receiving track during a period of time when the State Fair Society is not licensed to conduct live racing; and prohibiting the State Racing Commission from granting a permit to hold satellite simulcast betting at the Maryland State Fairgrounds in Timonium;
Title
Off-Track Betting - Maryland State Fairgrounds - Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] | Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] |
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Fairs
Gaming
Horse Racing
Licenses
Racing
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Emergency Bills
Fairs
Gaming
Horse Racing
Licenses
Racing
Telecommunications and Information Technology