MD HB710 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to conduct a study on gender-based equity in prerelease programming and facilities in Maryland that examines certain matters; and requiring the Commissioner to report the results of the study by January 1, 2020, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Correctional Services – Prerelease Study and Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-29 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Substitute Committee Amendment {302216/1 Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Amendment Withdrawn |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {962319/1 |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Correction, Division of
Demographics
Gender
Housing
Job Training
Prisoners
Public Safety
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Demographics
Gender
Housing
Job Training
Prisoners
Public Safety
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment