MD HB724 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a specified provision of law to authorize health care providers to require specified persons to pay a cost-based fee for providing specified information; altering the fees health care providers and hospitals may charge for copying and mailing specified medical records and for retrieving and preparing specified medical records; authorizing specified hospitals and other health care providers to charge specified fees for electronic copies of specified medical records; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-28HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
2016-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2016-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2016-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {437272/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2016-04-05SenateHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Finance
2016-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2016-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {896284/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2016-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0724&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0724f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0724t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0724e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_724_hb0724e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0724_89628401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0724_43727201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0724.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0724_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0724_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0724,h-0699&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0724,h-1195&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0724,s-1111&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback