MD HB731 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement agency to adopt by January 1, 2016, a written policy and procedure to govern specified disciplinary actions that may be taken against a specified law enforcement officer; requiring each written policy to include specified information; requiring, under specified circumstances, a law enforcement officer to be disciplined in accordance with a specified policy and procedure; etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Disciplinary Actions - Written Policy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |