MD HB736 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring incentives for the adoption and use of electronic health records to be paid in cash, unless a specified payor and health care provider agree on an incentive of equivalent value; prohibiting specified regulations from requiring a group model health maintenance organization from providing a specified incentive to a specified health care provider; requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to conduct a specified study and report findings to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2013; etc.
Title
Electronic Health Records - Incentives for Health Care Providers - Regulations
Sponsors
Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Donald Elliott [R] |
Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Wade Kach [R] | Del. Shawn Tarrant [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Computers
Electronic Commerce
Grants
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Physicians
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Computers
Electronic Commerce
Grants
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Physicians
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations