MD HB737 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB793
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of certain income tax disparity grants to counties and Baltimore City under certain circumstances and for certain fiscal years; and repealing a certain termination provision.
Title
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-17 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {349335/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {244464/1 Adopted |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB737 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Local Government | 16 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |