MD HB739 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Maternal Mental Health; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2016; and terminating the Act after December 31, 2016.
Title
Task Force to Study Maternal Mental Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {486485/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mental Health
Pregnancy
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Women
Committees and Commissions
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mental Health
Pregnancy
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Women