MD HB741 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority to conduct a certain feasibility study for developing, establishing, and operating a sports tourism facility at Reisterstown Regional Park in northwest Baltimore County; requiring the Authority to consult with certain governments, stakeholders, and entities; and requiring the Authority to submit a final report of its findings, conclusions, and recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 31, 2025.
Title
Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {893629/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB804 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Baltimore County
Commerce and Business
Construction
Economic Development
Forests and Parks
Public Works
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
studies
Sunset
Tourism
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commerce and Business
Construction
Economic Development
Forests and Parks
Public Works
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
studies
Sunset
Tourism
Work, Labor, and Employment