MD HB743 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of the maximum subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for specified retirement income under specified circumstances; including income from specified rollover individual retirement accounts in the subtraction modification under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Retirement Income
Sponsors
Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Kathy Afzali [R] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Jolene Ivey [D] |
Del. Aruna Miller [D] | Del. Steven Schuh [R] | Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |