MD HB751 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each local educational agency participating in the Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program to report by January 1 each year to the Department of Agriculture the types and amounts of farm products purchased from farms in the State.
Title
Agriculture - Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Reporting
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. William Frick [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. Shane Robinson [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (97-37) | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |