MD HB766 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-10)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-10)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim April 3 as Crime Victim and Advocate Commemorative Day to honor the individuals in the State who have become crime victims and the advocates who serve those victims; and requiring the Governor annually to take appropriate steps to publicize Crime Victim and Advocate Commemorative Day.
Title
State Government - Commemorative Days - Crime Victims and Advocates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (135-3) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments 666486/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |