MD HB77 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that attempted suicide is not a crime in the State; providing that the Act may not be construed to prohibit a person who commits one or more crimes in the course of attempting to commit suicide from being charged with the other crime or crimes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Decriminalization of Attempted Suicide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (104-34) (Y: 104 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-38) (Y: 104 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (104-34)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {528971/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (103-38)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {222411/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0077&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0077f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0077t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0077e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0077_22241101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0077_52897101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0077.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0077_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0130.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0077_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1274.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1525.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback