MD HB773 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, if a law enforcement officer testifies that the officer witnessed the taking of a blood specimen by a person who the officer reasonably believed was a qualified medical person, the officer's testimony shall be sufficient evidence that the person was a qualified medical person and that the blood was obtained in compliance with specified provisions without testimony by the person who obtained the blood specimen; etc.
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood Test
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630 |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {338076/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Evidence
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Witnesses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Evidence
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Witnesses