MD HB779 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Police Training Commission to expand the minimum curriculum and courses of study for police training to include special training on and attention to the exploitation of children, the contact with and treatment of the victims of crimes and delinquent acts, notices, services, support, and rights available to specified victims and their representatives, and the notification of the rights of identity fraud victims under federal law; etc.
Title
Police Training Commission - Additional Minimum Training Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Henry Heller [D] |
Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Wade Kach [R] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] |
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Education
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Police Training Commission
Victims
Education
Fraud
Identification
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Police Training Commission
Victims