MD HB78 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that specified fire investigation reports about chimney fires be filed with the State Fire Marshal; repealing a requirement that the State Fire Marshal establish and maintain a repository of specified chimney fire reports; etc.
Title
State Fire Marshal - Reporting Requirements - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92 |
2016-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-15 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |