MD HB781 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county superintendent to provide a specified individual with written notice of the reason for the transfer at least 10 days before the transfer of the individual.
Title
Teachers and Other Personnel - Transfer - Notice
Sponsors
Del. Hattie Harrison [D] | Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. James Proctor [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Del. Michael Vaughn [D] | Del. Jay Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn | |
2010-03-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0781.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0781f.pdf |