MD HB781 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the authority of a person who tows or removes a vehicle from a parking lot to charge specified persons for providing the required notice of the tow or removal; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {270513/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |