MD HB781 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified prohibition against a specified "person in a position of authority" from engaging in specified conduct to prohibit a specified person in a position of authority from engaging in sexual contact, a sexual act, or vaginal intercourse with a minor who is enrolled or participating in the institution, program, or activity at which the person in a position of authority works; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2014-04-07 | House | Delegates Dumais, Arora, and Hough |
2014-04-07 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-07 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2014-04-07 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {308970/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | House | Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {712110/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Contractors
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Education, Boards of
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Schools
Sexual Offenses
Sports and Recreation
Statutes of Limitation
Students
Teachers
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Education, Boards of
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Schools
Sexual Offenses
Sports and Recreation
Statutes of Limitation
Students
Teachers
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment