MD HB782 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that engaging in sexual contact with another without the consent of the other in connection with a first, second, or third degree burglary constitutes sexual offense in the third degree; establishing that, to be convicted under a specified provision of law, the defendant also must be convicted of a specified crime; altering the definitions of "tier I sex offender", "tier II sex offender", and "tier III sex offender" applicable to provisions relating to sex offender registration to include specified acts; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Burglary
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Sexual Offenses
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Sexual Offenses