MD HB782 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from charging a consumer a fee for placing a security freeze or for the first two temporary lifts of a security freeze in a calendar year if the consumer has received a notice of a breach of the security of a system under specified provisions of State or federal law, and provides a copy of the notice to the consumer reporting agency; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-34) (Y: 105 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-34) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Communications
Consumer Protection
Discrimination
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Ethics
Fees
General Assembly
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Human Rights
Job Training
Language
Medical Research
Notices
Patients
Physicians
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Communications
Consumer Protection
Discrimination
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Ethics
Fees
General Assembly
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Human Rights
Job Training
Language
Medical Research
Notices
Patients
Physicians
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials