MD HB789 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a penalty of up to $1,000 for certain violations of the Maryland Vehicle Law committed within a special event zone in Worcester County.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Event Zones in Worcester County - Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Emergency Bills
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Worcester County
Zoning and Planning
Emergency Bills
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Worcester County
Zoning and Planning