MD HB790 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the term "podiatrist" to be "podiatric physician".
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsors
Del. Ken Kerr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB311 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB182 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB182 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Health Occupations
Laws and Ordinances
Names
Physicians
Podiatrists
Rules and Regulations
State Documents
Health Occupations
Laws and Ordinances
Names
Physicians
Podiatrists
Rules and Regulations
State Documents