MD HB810 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the term "rapid fire trigger activator" to be "rapid fire activator"; adding "switch/auto-sear" to the definition of "rapid fire activator" for purposes of certain prohibitions on rapid fire activators; and prohibiting a person from transporting a rapid fire activator into the State or manufacturing, possessing, selling, offering for sale, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a rapid fire activator with a certain exception.
Title
Criminal Law - Rapid-Fire Activator - Switch/Auto-Sear
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-37) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-11) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {853128/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-36) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {203022/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Guns
Law Enforcement
Registration
Search and Seizure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Guns
Law Enforcement
Registration
Search and Seizure
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 4 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |