MD HB822 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that in Queen Anne's County, the governing body may establish an arts and entertainment district composed of noncontiguous areas in the county, including noncontiguous areas in a municipal corporation in the county, subject to the designation of the Secretary of Business and Economic Development; and requiring the governing body of Queen Anne's County to comply with specified application procedures.
Title
Queen Anne's County - Arts and Entertainment District
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Exemptions
Municipal Corporations
Queen Anne`s County
Revenue and Taxes
Zoning and Planning
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Exemptions
Municipal Corporations
Queen Anne`s County
Revenue and Taxes
Zoning and Planning