MD HB822 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide Maryland Medical Assistance Program services for qualified applicants who are at least 16 years old and for existing Program recipients under the Employed Individuals with Disabilities Program in accordance with certain requirements; prohibiting the Department from limiting eligibility to receive services under the EID Program based on certain criteria; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Employed Individuals With Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {293224/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Age
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Disabled
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Physically Disabled Persons
Public Health
Public Information
Reports
Work, Labor, and Employment
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Disabled
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Physically Disabled Persons
Public Health
Public Information
Reports
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |