MD HB836 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement based on a conviction of common law battery; and providing that a petition for expungement based on a conviction of common law battery may not be filed earlier than 15 years after the person satisfied the sentence or sentences imposed for all convictions for which expungement is requested, including parole, probation, or mandatory supervision.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law Battery
Sponsors
Sen. William Folden [R] | Del. Kathy Afzali [R] | Del. Trent Kittleman [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Ric Metzgar [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Special Order until evening session (Senator King) Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {452017/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |