MD HB84 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of Historic Annapolis, Inc. for the construction, repair, renovation, and reconstruction of the William Paca House, located in Annapolis; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - William Paca House Restoration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m. |
2013-03-05 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-14 | House | First Reading Appropriations |