MD HB848 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applying a specified limit on monetary transfers between campaign finance entities to transfers between specified campaign finance entities; repealing an exemption to a specified limit on monetary transfers between campaign finance entities; and altering the number of years after which a campaign finance entity is required to terminate and file a specified report under specified circumstances.
Title
Elections - Campaign Finance Entities - Transfer Limits and Termination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn | |
2010-02-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/9 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0848.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0848f.pdf |