MD HB85 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an automated purchasing machine to require a seller of specified personal property to provide specified information before the completion of a transaction; requiring an automated purchasing machine to verify specified information through specified documentation submitted by a seller; establishing specified record keeping and reporting requirements for an APM operator; requiring an APM operator to keep specified personal property in the State for a specified period of time; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-09-12 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Checks
Commerce and Business
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Identification
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Privacy
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Vending Machines
Checks
Commerce and Business
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Identification
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Privacy
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Vending Machines