MD HB85 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified organizations in Anne Arundel County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino event under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the County Department of Inspections and Permits; specifying that a permit holder may receive no more than one permit per calendar year; requiring a participant in specified gaming events to be at least 21 years of age; requiring an individual who volunteers as an operator of specified gaming events to be at least 18 years of age; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {669632/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {935564/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Alcoholic Beverages
Anne Arundel County
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Fees
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages
Anne Arundel County
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Fees
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations