MD HB852 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified provision of law so as to prohibit a judge from sentencing an individual to the jurisdiction of the Division of Correction for 12 months or less unless the individual is an inmate under the jurisdiction of the Division of Correction.
Title
Correctional Services - Division of Correction - Length of Sentence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-20 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-17 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Judiciary |