MD HB86 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the student member of the Montgomery County Board of Education to attend an executive session of the Board of Education that relates to a specified matter; and authorizing the student member of the Montgomery County Board of Education to vote on specified matters.
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting MC 7-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-10) (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-10) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:15 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |