MD HB860 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law subjecting individuals convicted of specified felonies involving a controlled dangerous substance who apply for temporary cash assistance or food stamps to specified testing and treatment requirements and sanctions; altering the criminal violations that make specified recipients ineligible for temporary cash assistance or food stamps for 1 year after conviction and subject to specified testing and treatment requirements and sanctions; etc.
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-55) (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-52) (Y: 83 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-52) (Y: 83 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793 |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (84-55) |
2017-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-15) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {287476/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (83-52) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-13 | House | Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {144460/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Ex-Offenders
Food Stamps
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Parole and Probation
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally
Welfare
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Ex-Offenders
Food Stamps
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Parole and Probation
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally
Welfare