MD HB864 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB473
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1110
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1110
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $20,000 of military retirement income received by an individual during the taxable year if the individual has received a determination of a 100% service-connected disability from the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {135268/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB864 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1110 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1110 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |