MD HB866 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class L beer, wine, and liquor license in Allegany County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a holder of a manufacturer's license; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell or provide samples of certain beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption; establishing the Class D (on-sale) beer and wine Arts and Entertainment District license in Allegany County; authorizing the Board to issue the license to a for-profit festival promoter; etc.
Title
Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {723190/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Allegany County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Fairs
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Allegany County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Fairs
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Time