MD HB873 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending from January 1, 2017, to January 1, 2022, the termination of an income tax credit that specified individuals or corporations may claim against the State income tax for costs incurred to obtain federal security clearances, to rent specified facilities, and to construct or renovate a sensitive compartmented information facility.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-34) (Y: 105 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-34) (Y: 105 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-34) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Construction
Corporations
Equipment
Federal Government
Income Tax
Leases and Rent
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Corporations
Equipment
Federal Government
Income Tax
Leases and Rent
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income