MD HB88 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making specified provisions of law relating to refillable containers applicable with respect to wine in Montgomery County; establishing a refillable wine container permit in Montgomery County; authorizing the Montgomery County Board of License Commissioners to issue the permit to a holder of a license that entitles the holder to sell wine for off-premises consumption under specified circumstances; specifying the permit authorizes the permit holder to sell wine for consumption off the licensed premises in a refillable container; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers MC 19-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {243396/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Comptroller
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Comptroller
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County