MD HB887 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Executive Director of the Social Services Administration to provide the Secretary of Health with identifying information regarding an individual who has had the individual's parental rights terminated under a certain provision of law and who has been suspected of abuse or neglect; and requiring the Department of Human Services to report to the Governor and General Assembly on the implementation of a plan by the State to search certain databases of other states to identify persons responsible for abuse and neglect; etc.
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2020-02-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB1041 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Data
Disclosure
Family Law
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Social Services
Data
Disclosure
Family Law
Health, Department of
Human Services, Department of
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Social Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |