MD HB89 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a specified report regarding exposure to a possible rabies infection that involves a dog bite include the breed of the dog, the size of the dog, and the circumstances surrounding the incident.
Title
Health - Reports Relating to Dog Bites - Required Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-08-13 | House | Pre-filed |