MD HB89 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class BD-BWL alcoholic beverages license in Montgomery County; authorizing the Board to issue a refillable container permit renewable yearly concurrently with the renewal of a Class BD-BWL license; providing that the terms and hours of sale of a refillable container permit are the same as the underlying license; requiring an applicant, prior to obtaining a BD-BWL license, to attest to a specified proportion of future food and alcoholic beverage sales under specified circumstances; setting an annual license fee of $3,500; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BD-BWL License MC 18-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {483690/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Auditors and Audits
Beverage Containers
Fees
Food
Inspections
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Records
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Auditors and Audits
Beverage Containers
Fees
Food
Inspections
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Records
Rules and Regulations