MD HB893 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $28,183,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public buildings, roads, and facilities in Calvert County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617 |
2022-04-01 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-04-01 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {863325/1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {553428/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB442 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Calvert County
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works