MD HB894 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an entity owned, operated, or controlled by the government of certain countries subject to an embargo under the International Traffic in Arms Regulations from participating in any procurement with the State, a local government in the State, a public instrumentality in the State, or any governmental unit in the State; requiring the Board of Public Works to make certain determinations and maintain and publish a certain list of scrutinized entities; preempting any local ordinance, rule, or regulation that conflicts with the Act; etc.
Title
Procurement - Scrutinized Entities - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {703429/1 Adopted |
2024-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Attorney General
Counties
Ethics
Fees
Foreign Ownership
Goods and Services
International Affairs
internet
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Counties
Ethics
Fees
Foreign Ownership
Goods and Services
International Affairs
internet
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Procurement
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 17-7A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17-7A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17-7A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17-7A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17-7A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17-7A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |